Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Equipmentshare.Com, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Wallace, Richard J, Iii, against Delta Excavation And Concrete Llc, Sanchez, Luis, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a complaint for breach of contract and for debt owed related to rental equipment. Plaintiff, EquipmentShare.com, Inc. (hereinafter, “EquipmentShare”), sues Defendants, Luis Sanchez d/b/a Delta Excavation and Concrete LLC (hereinafter, “Sanche...
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 04, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 10, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: October 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 27, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: November 01, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 19, 2021MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2021ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: September 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
191FINAL DISMISSAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF RICHARD J. WALLACE III AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S SOLDIERS & SAILORS AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT SOLDIERS & SAILORS AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - SOS - DELTA EXCAVATION AND CONCRETE RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - LUIS SANCHEZ RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG SOS DELTA EXCAVATION AND CONCRETE LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.