Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Continental Carbonic Products, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Starnes, A. Raylee, against New Buffalo Processing Technologies, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - NONSUIT | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - NEW BUFFALO PROCESSING TECHNOLOGIES RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION NEW BUFFALO PROCESSING TECHNOLOGIES |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - NEW BUFFALO PROCESSING TECHNOLOGIES ISSUE CITATION |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.