Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Myers, Juanita, filed a(n) Property case represented by Richard, Scott Howard, against Walmart Inc., represented by Johnson, David Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 24, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 23, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: September 01, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: August 23, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 21, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I Jury Trial - Civil L3 |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF/ NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT DEF/NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 3) SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 3 |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I TRIAL SETTING (JURY) Trial Notice and Scheduling Order e-mailed to counsel. |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - WALMART INC. ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - WALMART INC. RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION WALMART INC. |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER REQUEST FOR SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.