Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fortunado, Giovanni, Fortunado, Shabnam, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Grisham, Robert N, Ii, against Texas Farmers Insurance Company, represented by Fisher, David Jefferson, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 17, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF TRANSFER UNDER RULE 13/TAG-ALONG CASE
Date: October 05, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: July 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: March 31, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: April 06, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: May 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: October 31, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: May 23, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 10, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: July 15, 2021ORDER - REMAND (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: October 11, 2022MOTION - NONSUIT
Date: January 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NONSUIT MOTION - NONSUIT |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT JOINT |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER TO REMAND ORDER - REMAND (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN CASE) |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
VACATION LETTER AMENDED |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION DALLAS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
GIOVANNI GORTUNATO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION GIOVANNI FORTUNATO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.