Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Great Lakes Development, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Fraser, John D, against Lekha & Megha, Llc, Nettem, Ramu, Rao Challa, Masheswar, Tripuraneni, Dinesh, Uni King, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Choe, Jason E, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 17, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 10, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 22, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 01, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 14, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 14, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 15, 2022RESPONSE
Date: June 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2022RESPONSE
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: April 27, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: December 12, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 23, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: November 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion - Summary Judgment PLT * KASHOWNNA ROSS 972 826 4452 **ATT WILL KEEP THIS DATE & TIME** |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER TO STRIKE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MSJ & OBJECTIONS TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE RESPONSE |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COURTESY COPIES - BLACK BINDER - HEARING FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 06/23/2022 AT 1:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.