Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Craddock, Thomas W, filed a(n) Property case represented by Ryback, Jennifer M., Thomas, Steven H, against Kroger Texas L.P., The Kroger Co, represented by Briscoe, B Kyle, Lightfoot, Seth R, Miranda, Hope Zimlich, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 12, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 17, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 13, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 24, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 17, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 12, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 20, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: April 13, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 08, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 08, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 08, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 10, 2021MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: March 02, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 04, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2022ORDER - PROTECT
Date: March 10, 2022MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: April 20, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: December 20, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: April 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2022Motion - Sanctions
Date: June 08, 2022ORDER - LEAVE
Date: April 15, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 21, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RANDY DAVIS |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil (Expedited Action) |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SANCTS - SPOLIATION PRESUMPTION Motion - Sanctions PLTF-1HR-FILED-04/20/2022-SET BY-DARLENE OVERALL-214-954-6831 **IN PERSON HEARING** **CC REQUESTED** |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO - THOMAS CRADDOCK CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION THOMAS CRADDOCK |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND SPOLIATION PRESUMPTION MOTION - SANCTIONS AND SPOLIATION PRESUMPTION |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SANCTS - SPOLIATION PRESUMPTION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND SPOLIATION PRESUMPTION |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX IN EXCESS - 25 PAGE LIMITATION |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGE LIMITATION MOTION - LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX IN EXCESS OF 25 PAGE LIMITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.