Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ferguson, Angela, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nohinek, John C, against Arch, Daniel Paul, Capps Rent-A-Car, Inc., Nexius Solutions, Inc., Nwon, Llc., Velex, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Fifield, Andrew Tucker, Martinez, Michael G, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 30, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 03, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2021MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: September 01, 2021ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: September 07, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 09, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 07, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - DEFENDANT
Date: August 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 30, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 21, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: October 27, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: January 18, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 04, 2022MOTION - NONSUIT
Date: October 19, 2021ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT
Date: October 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 15, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 31, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: January 18, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: January 18, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: January 26, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 17, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 31, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 24, 2022NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 24, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 27, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: February 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 15, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 14, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: January 18, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: May 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 05, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 31, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: January 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 31, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 24, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2022MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: February 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2022MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: March 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 10, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: June 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 05, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 05, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: May 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 10, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: August 29, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: May 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 08, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: June 30, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 11, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: August 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2022Motion - Transfer
Date: August 12, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: September 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 13, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: December 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 31, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 27, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: October 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO - MEDICAL RECORDS |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - TEXAS HEALTH PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL PLANO RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION - BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-GRAPEVINE-MEDICAL CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-GRAPEVINE-MEDICAL |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION BRADLEY HUBBARD MD CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BRADLEY HUBBARD MD |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION - RHEUMATOLOGY ASSOCIATES CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RHEUMATOLOGY ASSOCIATES |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICTE OF DEPOSITION - DANIEL ARCH CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION DANIEL ARCH |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION DANIEL PAUL ARCH |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENTION DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.