Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rooha Realty Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Skinner, Stephen Douglas, against Gupta, Neha Singal, Sn Dallas-American Corporation, represented by Clark, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 09, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: August 09, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 02, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 30, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 21, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: September 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT ABOUT TRIAL CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LETTER FILING JUDGMENT |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING (NON JURY) | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER LEVEL 2 |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL NON-JURY |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.