Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Vikor Scientific, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Nash, Connor, against Arroyo, Nicolas, Eckerbrecht, Gary, Frasch, Julie, Genetic Technological Innovations. Llc S, Glimcher S, Nicholas, (total of 9) See All represented by Erdle, James C, Jr., Erdle, James C, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
This is a petition for a temporary restraining order, temporary injunction, and permanent injunction filed in Texas state court by former employees of Plaintiff who continue to solicit, steal, redirect, and hijack Plaintiff's business partners, clien...
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2021ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: July 02, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021Special Appearance
Date: August 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021Temporary Injunction
Date: July 20, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: July 15, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 21, 2021TRO HEARING
Date: June 22, 2021ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: June 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2021ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: June 22, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: June 22, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 22, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: June 22, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: June 25, 2021MOTION - EXTEND
Date: June 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: June 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 30, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 30, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 02, 2021TRUST RECEIPT
Date: July 23, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 22, 2021ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: July 21, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: July 15, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: July 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 15, 2021ISSUE WRIT
Date: July 23, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: August 12, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: August 12, 2021MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: July 30, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 26, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: August 05, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 26, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION
Date: July 30, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 14, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2021SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION
Date: July 14, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: July 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 13, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: August 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 16, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 16, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2021Special Appearance
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel PLTF-30M-FILED-09/13/2021-SET BY-CONNOR NASH-214-395-9504 **TELEPHONIC HEARING***COUNSEL PROVIDED CALL-IN INFO |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY - DEF(S) RESPONSE - MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPO - MATERIAL WITNESSES RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY - DEF(S) - MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPO - MATERIAL WITNESSES |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO RESPONSE DEFENDANTS - TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPO |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG SOS-PHILIP LAMB(APPLICATION TRO-JUNE 21, 21) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG SOS-PHILIP LAMB (SUPPLEMENTAL ORIGINAL JULY 14, 21) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG SOS-NICOLOS ARROYO (SECOND SUPPLEMENT -JULY 30,21) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG SOS-NICOLOS ARROYO (SUPPLEMENTAL ORIGINAL JULY 14, 21) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG SOS-NICOLOS ARROYO (APPLICATION TRO-JUNE 21, 21) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG SOS-PHILIP LAMB(SECOND SUPPLEMENT -JULY 30,21) |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS HEARING NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.