Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ortolani, Shelley, filed a(n) Property case represented by Chacko, Jennifer, against Aces Ac & Heat Llc, Deerose Realty Group, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 07, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 11, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 17, 2021WAIVER
Date: June 28, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 14, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 06, 2021REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 30, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: November 09, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 01, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 15, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 23, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION - SENT TO JENNIFER CHACKO RETURNED MAIL |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference 9/15 ORDER DISCHARGED P ATTY |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INTERPLEADER BOND REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER - SENT TO JENNIFER CHAKO RETURNED MAIL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER - SENT TO JENNIFER CHACKO |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference NOTICE SENT TO P & D |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER PETITION IN INTERPLEADER ORDER - MISC. PETITION IN INTERPLEADER |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - RE: ORDER ON PETITION IN INTERPLEADER MOTION HEARING 15 MIN DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY JENNIFER CHACHO 734-730-7276 IN PERSON |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE - SENT TO JENNIFER CHACKO RETURNED MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.