Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Strader, Angela, Strader, Tommy, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Callahan, Michael, against Does 1 Through 75, Inclusive, Marritoo International, Inc., Starwood Capital Group Global 1, Llc, Starwood Capital Group, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTE - CLERKS
Date: March 30, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 31, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: March 30, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: October 26, 2021MOTION - RETAIN
Date: February 23, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: October 25, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 11, 2021ISSUE SUBPOENA
Date: October 13, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2021MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO MICHAEL CALLAHAN NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER TO ALL PLTF |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal re-set. E-mailed counsel. |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Set for Dismissal. E-mailed counsel. |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION QUASH DEPOSITION MOTION - QUASH SUPPLEMENT TO ITS' MOTION TO QUASH THE NOTICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR BUSINESS RECORDS |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
WITNESS(360 WRAPS) MOTION QUASH MOTION - QUASH NOTICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR BUSINESS RECORDS OF 360 WRAPS, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.