Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gutierrez, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scheumack, Griffin, against Escamilla, Kayla, represented by Westmoreland, Brad K., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 16, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: October 19, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: October 12, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 12, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 12, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 28, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 08, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 16, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 08, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 26, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: November 10, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 13, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 26, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 03, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 01, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF DISMISSMAL WITH PREJUDICE TO ALL PARTIES |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT FILING MOTION AND ORDER DISMISSAL and Proposed Order CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER DISMISSAL |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Initial Trial Setting (Level 2) SETTLEMENT PENDING |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITON CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION JOSE GUTIERREZ |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENTION DISCOVERY |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT DISCOVERY PLTF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DISCOVERY AGAINST DEFT(S) PURSUANT TO TEX. R. CIV. P. 193.7 |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY COVER LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LTR TO CRT FILING PLAINTIFF S 193.7 NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.