Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Taco Bueno Inc, Taco Bueno Restaurant Inc, Taco Bueno Restaurant Lp, Taco Bueno Restaurants Inc., Taco Bueno Restaurants Lp, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Tax Appraisal - Tax case represented by Nanson, Jeffrey L, Nanson, Jeffrey L., Seale, Emily, against Dallas Central Appraisal District, represented by Metcalf, Braden W., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2019 |
CategoryTax Appraisal |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeTax Appraisal |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 08, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 15, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 30, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 10, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 10, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 09, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 15, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 08, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 10, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 09, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 10, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 11, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 28, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 10, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2019SETTLED
Date: January 07, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: December 11, 2019NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: January 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF AGEED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) MAILED TO EMILY SEALE NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL |
|
January 18, 2021 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
116TH NON-JURY TRIAL NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SETTLED | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL JURY DEMAND |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.