Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hubbard, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Herz, Jill, Truong, Gordan, against Luna, Leonardo, represented by Archibald, Chad T., Wright, Rachel L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2017ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 01, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 20, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 06, 2017MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 19, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 19, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 09, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 28, 2017SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 20, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2017MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 19, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 19, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 06, 2017ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 01, 2018DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 28, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 22, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 31, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: January 16, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 27, 2018PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: January 09, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017DISCOVERY
Date: January 16, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: January 16, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: January 16, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: January 16, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: January 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2017MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 12, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: June 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 05, 2018Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 30, 2019Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: April 10, 2020PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: June 07, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 14, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 06, 2017ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 03, 2017MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: June 07, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: June 07, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: September 14, 2018OBJECTION
Date: June 17, 2021CHARGE OF COURT
Date: June 17, 2021CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: September 06, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 20, 2019JURY DEMAND
Date: November 03, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: July 01, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: June 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2019RULE 166
Date: January 09, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 09, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: January 09, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: June 07, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 07, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 10, 2021STRIKE SHEET
Date: June 17, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JUDGMENT DEFENSE VERDICT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO DEF(S) UNTIMELY ARGUMENTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF(S) AFFDVTS |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET DEFENDANT |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET PLAINTIFF |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | JURY SWORN PANEL (OCA) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CORR LETTER RE: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
116th Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil 2 DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.