Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ittigson, Fenny, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ranen, Robert D, against Mcintosh, Corliss, represented by Harlin, Trey, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2014ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 30, 2015MOTION - QUASH
Date: November 23, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 26, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 30, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 29, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court Coordinator.02.29.16 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE AD LITEM PAID |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minor Prove Up 30M - MINOR - DELENA - 9724843529 - CC REQ |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED AGREED, COPY ALL |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
2 Judgment-Minor MOTHER AS NEXT FRIEND ITTIGSON NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
2 Stl & Release-Basic MOTHER AS NEXT FRIEND ITTIGSON NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT SETTLE & RELEASE |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/FEES SUBMITTED |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/SETTLE SUBMITTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.