Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Jensen, Dale D, against Nickerson, Octavious, One Thousand Three Hundred Seventy-Seven Dollars In United States Currency, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Conference SET BY JUDGE |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CITATION AA/ATTY |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Conference SET BY JUDGE |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.