Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Compass Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Taplett, Matthew, against Bam Contractors, Inc., Rabah, Hasan M., U S A Enviromental Group Inc, represented by Maris, Robert Frank, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJORDAN, JIM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 20, 2011AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 27, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Order of Nonsuit signed 12/12/11 |
|
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/NONSUIT- SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
12-12-2011 - Notice of NonSuit CV - DC1016835 - 6496039 NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference Joint Status Report filed 6/17/11 |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
06-17-2011 - Miscellaneous Event CV - DC1016835 - 4464626 MISCELLANOUS EVENT JOINT STATUS REPORT LVL 2 |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-27-2011 - Amended Petition CV - DC1016835 - 4282597 (1) AMENDED PETITION 2ND |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Def original answer filed 5/20/11 |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-20-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1016835 - 4212013 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-28-2011 - Rule 11 CV - DC1016835 - 3999279 RULE 11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.