Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gage, Mischa, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Stewart, Amy Elizabeth, against Chubb Lloyds Insurance Company Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with CORTEZ, CARLOS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCORTEZ, CARLOS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryInsurance |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 30, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
3-30-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1016834 - 3721286 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE WITH ORDER |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
3-30-2011 - Notice of NonSuit CV - DC1016834 - 3721268 NOTICE OF NONSUIT PER ATTY'S EFILING INSTRUCT WILL SEND ORDER. |
|
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CITATION PCT 1 |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Case Filing Cover Sheet CV - DC1016834 - 3062570 CASE FILING COVER SHEET |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1016834 - 3062447 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) E-FILED |
|
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-31-2010 - Jury Demand CV - DC1016834 - 3083142 JURY DEMAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.