Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Berry, Annette, Wheat, Sherman, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Purdue, Keith C., against Belt Line Operation Llc, represented by Weigel, Charles T, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with MOLBERG, KEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOLBERG, KEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 09, 2011ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 21, 2011MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 21, 2011ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 21, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-20-2011 - Certificate of Written Discovery CV - DC1016824 - 3923405 CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-21-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1016824 - 3621397 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-18-2011 - Jury Demand CV - DC1016824 - 3646667 JURY DEMAND |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-09-2011 - Scheduling Order - DC Civ M - DC1016824 - 459 - 3551501 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Mary Burdin appointed mediator. Set for Non-Jury Trial: January 3, 2012. Notice mailed to all counsel. Scheduling & Discovery Order mailed to all counsel. Letter to Mediator. Order to Clerk: Scheduling & Discovery Order dated: 3/9/11. |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-04-2011 - Certificate of Written Discovery CV - DC1016824 - 3493162 CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Answer filed. |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion - Quash CANCELED BY KEITH PURDUE 214.220.9191 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.