Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allstate Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tessmer, Heather C, against Hernandez, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with LOWY, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLOWY, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status Conference REC'D NON-SUIT |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
January 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CITATION MAILED ATTY 2-10-11 JG |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
12-30-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1016791 - 3056189 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) E-FILED |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.