Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kitchens, Anna, Kitchens, Steve, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Barrientos, Joseph, against Covenant Health System, Ethicon Endo-Sergery Services, L.P., Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc., Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Fanning, Barry Hedges, Hudson, Timothy, Hund, Jim, Mccue, David C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2010 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is a civil lawsuit originating in Texas. The plaintiffs, Anna Kitchens and Steve Kitchens, are suing on behalf of the estate of Latosha Murray, deceased, and on behalf of all those entitled to recover for the wrongful death of Latosha Murray. Th...
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 29, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 22, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: August 20, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 15, 2010AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 21, 2011VACATION LETTER
Date: November 10, 2010SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 28, 2011AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 07, 2011MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: July 07, 2011AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 17, 2011ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: October 24, 2011MOTION - VACATE
Date: October 19, 2011ORDER - SEVER
Date: January 25, 2012MOTION - SEVER
Date: January 25, 2012CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 27, 2012ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: September 28, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 21, 2011RESPONSE
Date: September 21, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 06, 2012RESPONSE
Date: September 07, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 09, 2012SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 30, 2012NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 30, 2012AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 08, 2013MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: December 11, 2012ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 10, 2013CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 28, 2013AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 24, 2013ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: July 19, 2011ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: July 15, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 03, 2013RESPONSE
Date: June 17, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR F/J SIGNED 10/7/13 |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/FINAL JUDGMENT - SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minor Prove Up CARMEN |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT PROVE-UP |
|
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Final Disposition Hearing |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion - Summary Judgment 30 MIN JOHN BROOKS 972/860-0391 |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR appt gal copied |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM CARMEN MITCHELL |
|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/APPT GUARD AD LITEM - SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.