Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
O Foreclosure, Texas Tax Rescue Ii Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Laws, Raymond Gary, against Hale, Robina, Option One Mortgage Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: March 01, 2010MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 26, 2010ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: January 27, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2009ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 01, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 21, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT E-FILED |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRETRIAL | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
2-26-2010 - Motion - Continuance CV - DC0917475 - 1582021 MOTION - CONTINUANCE E-FILED |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE E-FILED - FORECLOSURE |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRETRIAL | |
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
12-30-2009 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC0917475 - 1467444 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.