Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Nguyen, Lyna P, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anderson, Ryan H, Renteria, Juan, against Tucker, Dillon G, represented by Myers, Kristi C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOYE', ERIC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 13, 2010AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 27, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2009DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: January 10, 2011SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 12, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 08, 2010VACATION LETTER
Date: July 09, 2010MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 05, 2011MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 10, 2011ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: March 23, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-23-2011 - Order - Dismissal - DC Civ M - DC0917462 - 857 - 3669870 ORDER - DISMISSAL |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FINAL DISPOSITION NOTICES FAXED AND MAILED. |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-18-2011 - Miscellaneous Event CV - DC0917462 - 3156864 MISCELLANOUS EVENT N/INTENT TO USE DISCVRY |
|
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-10-2011 - Designation of Expert Witness(es) CV - DC0917462 - 3098825 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-10-2011 - Motion - In Limine CV - DC0917462 - 3098824 MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-10-2011 - Proposed Jury Charge CV - DC0917462 - 3098823 PROPOSED JURY CHARGE |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | SETTLED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.