Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, against Mcminn, Harold P., Mcminn, Michael Patrick, Tamarack Shores Owners Assoc., represented by Ronald Friesenhahn, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2010 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
DOCUMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
DOCUMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF SALE
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.