Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, against Southwest Post Tension Systems Inc, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Judicial Officer: Robison, Jack )
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
SERVICE
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation-By Certified Mail SOUTHWEST POST TENSION SYSTEMS INC Returned Unserved 06/15/2012 Returned 06/15/2012
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
CITATION
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation INC, SOUTHWEST POST TENSION SYSTEMS Returned Unserved 12/27/2010 Returned 12/27/2010
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Financial Recap
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Filed
Judge: Robison, Jack |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: Robison, Jack |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.