Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, against Mortgage Electronic Registration, Milestone Mortgage Corporation  Milestone Lending Corporation, Holmes, Barry, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSED
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CITATION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation HOLMES, BARRY Served 01/07/2009 Response Due 02/02/2009
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Served 12/17/2008 Response Due 01/12/2009
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Financial Recap
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: REGISTRATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.