Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, against Saldivar, David, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSED
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NON-SUIT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation SALDIVAR, DAVID Served 01/22/2008 Response Due 02/18/2008
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
CITATION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Financial Recap
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: SALDIVAR, DAVID Disposition: DISMISSED-WANT OF PROSECUTION Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.