Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, against Gerhardt, Robert Lee, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSED
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Jack)
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Served 01/15/2008 Response Due 02/11/2008
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
CITATION
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Financial Recap
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment
Judge: Waldrip, Dib Converted Disposition:Party: GERHARDT, ROBERT LEE Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: CINDY CUMMINGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.