Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, against Green Tree Servicing Llc, Betancourt, Maribel, represented by Laura Marion-Faul, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
May 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF SALE
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Steel, Gary)
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSED
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Steel, Gary)
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
RESPONSES
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.