Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, Attorney Ad Litem, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, Ronald Friesenhahn, against Mccune, Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
LETTER
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
DOCUMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF SALE
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial on the Merits (9:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Jack)
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: LITEM, ATTORNEY AD Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.