Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Comal, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Gilbert T. Bragg, against United States Of America, Askew, Jason L, represented by James F. Gilligan, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Steel, Gary)
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSED
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Served 12/20/2007 Response Due 01/14/2008
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
CITATION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation ASKEW, JASON L Served 01/05/2008 Response Due 01/28/2008
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.