Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Noriega, Araceli, filed a(n) case against De Jesus Noriega, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (Judicial Officer: Wigington, Deborah ) | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR PROVE-UP | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER FOR DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.