Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Suits On Debt case represented by Matthew W. Cooper, against Wood, Randy, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Boyer, R. Bruce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoyer, R. Bruce Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategorySuits On Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Non Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NONSUIT (Judicial Officer: Boyer, R. Bruce ) | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PROCESS | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.