Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tienda, Joel Eric, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fernando R. Cruz, against Nicholson, Kelly Gale, represented by Ralph M. Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Wright-Reneau, Tracie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWright-Reneau, Tracie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:01 AM) () Other |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RULE 11 | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSTION | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORTER'S CERTIFICATIION OF DEPOSITION OF: | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELIVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.