Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nbl 300 Group Ltd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rafael Pizana, Iii, against Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority Industrial Development Corporation, represented by Joshua D Katz, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Steel, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waldrip, Dib) Result: Passed Hearing
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
SERVICE
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Citation Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority Industrial Development Corporation Unserved
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Judge: Steel, Gary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.