Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, Winter, Curtis L., Winter, Curtis L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Winter, Kellie L, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Morton, Mary A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment After Original Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Morton, Mary A.)
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES #####
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER (Judicial Officer: Morton, Mary A. )
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
PJA - MOTION TO MODIFY-OTHER
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER (Judicial Officer: Stephens, Charles A., II )
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial on the Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waldrip, Dib) Result: Granted
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
RULE 11
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.