Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barboza, Angelica, Barboza, Michael, State Of Texas, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Morton, Mary A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryIv-D - Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO TRANSFER
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
PJA - MOTION TO MODIFY-OTHER
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO TRANSFER
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Morton, Mary A.)
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
###### JUDGE'S DOCKET SHEET/NOTES #####
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER (Judicial Officer: Morton, Mary A. )
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waterhouse, A. Mendoza)
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESET ORDER
Judge: Morton, Mary A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.