Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, Griffth, Kaitlyn, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Waldrip, Dib presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryIv-D - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT OF COURT ORDER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Judicial Officer: Waldrip, Dib )
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Drop Docket (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Jack)
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DOCKET LETTER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waterhouse, A. Mendoza)
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESET ORDER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.