Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryIv-D - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waterhouse, A. Mendoza) | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | RESET ORDER | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waterhouse, A. Mendoza) | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | SERVICE | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve AGUILAR, CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY Returned Unserved 01/26/2015 Returned 01/26/2015 | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation AGUILAR, CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY Returned Unserved 01/26/2015 Returned 01/26/2015 | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.