Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Law Office Of Phiang Aldrich, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Stephens, Charles A., II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryIv-D - Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
DOCKET SHEET/JUDGE'S NOTES
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waterhouse, A. Mendoza)
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESET ORDER
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Trial on the Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stephens, Charles A., II) Result: Passed Hearing
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stephens, Charles A., II) Result: Reset
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Trial on the Merits Passed CANCELED Trial on the Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stephens, Charles A., II) Passed Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other Passed CANCELED Other (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Stephens, Charles A., II) Passed Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: Stephens, Charles A., II |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.