Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations Llc J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Julie Pi Evans, against Crocker, Brent, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Waldrip, Dib presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaldrip, Dib Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2010 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
REQUEST
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
DOCKET SHEET/JUDGE'S NOTES
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waldrip, Dib) Result: Motion Granted
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waldrip, Dib) Result: Reset
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Financial Recap
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.