Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torres, Eric, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Stephen Foster, against Ohi Trading Company, Armke, Ken, Armke, Kegan, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Steel, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteel, Gary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2010 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation COMPANY, OHI TRADING Served 12/17/2010 Response Due 01/10/2011
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation ARMKE, KEGAN Served 12/17/2010 Response Due 01/10/2011
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation ARMKE, KEN Served 12/17/2010 Response Due 01/10/2011
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
CITATION
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Filed
Judge: Steel, Gary |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Financial Recap
Judge: Steel, Gary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.