Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Granite, Keystone Keystone Granite, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by James Bettersworth, against Pence, Jason M, Pence, Heather C, J Pence Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
RULE AGREEMENT
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution PENCE, HEATHER C Returned Unserved 12/08/2009 Returned 12/08/2009
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution LLC, J PENCE CONSTRUCTION Returned Unserved 12/08/2009 Returned 12/08/2009
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution PENCE, JASON M Returned Unserved 12/08/2009 Returned 12/08/2009
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SENT
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution PENCE, HEATHER C Unserved
Judge: Steel, Gary Converted Disposition:Party: PENCE, HEATHER C Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGEMENT Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: RICK ROBERTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.