Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Re, In In Re, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Geoffrey I Barr, against Hurd, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2008 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Precept to Serve HURD, CHRIS Served 02/03/2009 Response Due 03/02/2009
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
PRE
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSED
Judge: Ramsay, Charles Converted Disposition:Party: HURD, CHRIS Disposition: FINAL - NON JURY Reporter: GRACE DUNCAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.