Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Taylor, Joseph, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Stewart, Samuel Logan, represented by Bridget A. Douglass, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Jack) Result: Reset
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Jack) Result: Reset
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
CASE DISPOSED
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NON-SUIT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
RULE AGREEMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: STEWART, SAMUEL LOGAN Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Judgment : For Plaintiff Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.