Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General, Freudenberg, Lana A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Biggs, Stephen L., in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Waldrip, Dib presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaldrip, Dib Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2007 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment After Original Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER (Judicial Officer: Waldrip, Dib )
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
WAIVER OF SERVICE
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial on the Merits Passed CANCELED Trial on the Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Waldrip, Dib) Passed Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Trial on the Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stephens, Charles A., II) Result: Passed Hearing
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Drop Docket (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Robison, Jack) Result: Retained
Judge: Waldrip, Dib |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.