Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schero, Hilary Layne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moreno, Jose Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts with Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2007 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Witholding
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHHOLDING
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Witholding
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHHOLDING
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHHOLDING
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF WITHHOLDING
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
|
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
ISSUANCE OF EMPLOYERS ORDER
Judge: Robison, Jack Converted Disposition:Party: MORENO, JOSE MANUEL Disposition: AGREED JUDGEMENT Reporter: MARY BRAUN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.