Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodate, Karen, filed a(n) Other Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) case against Anderson, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2009 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time41 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Rodate, K. vs. Anderson, J. Motion OSC Details: 211255 - Harassment ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 15 2009 Type: 243410 - Dismissal: Other Court Ordered Manner : 251110 - After Court Trial |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Rodate, K. vs. Anderson, J. Motion OSC Details: 211255 - Harassment ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order: Amended 213620-Minute Order: Amended Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER: AMENDED [213620] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By RESPONDENT PRO PER [911320] |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By RESPONDENT PRO PER [911320] |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request 229110-Request Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST [229110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.