Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Financial Casualty & Surety Inc. filed a(n) case against Stewart, Allen Leon, in the jurisdiction of Comal County, TX, . Comal County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 2.
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2024 |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2024 |
Filing LocationComal County, TX |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | CITATION BY CERTIFED MAIL-NISI | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation-By Certified Mail SAENZ, ALBERT Unserved Response Received 03/27/2024 | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT - NISI FILED | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation-By Certified Mail FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY INC. Served 03/09/2024 Response Received 03/27/2024 Returned 03/11/2024 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NISI (OCA) | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.