Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
All Interested Parties filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryProbate - Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Certified Copies | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Creditors | |
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Inventory or Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory (OCA) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Notice to Beneficiaries | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Admit Letters Testamentary & Issue Letters | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Inventory Extension | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Last Will & Testament original original |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Letters | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Signed Order ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE. Judge Weldon Copeland Signed Order ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE. Judge Weldon Copeland |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Oath |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.